+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
- Set for hearing April 18 in B., P. & E.D. pending receipt.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor