+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On August 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 2528.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar by Assembly Member Waldron.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1020.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 594.) (April 14).
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2015: Special Consent #7 SB110 Fuller
- Yeas: 40
August 20, 2015: SB 110 Fuller Senate Third Reading By WALDRON
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
July 8, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB110 Fuller
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor