+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 468, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2417.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 2722.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1248.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1145.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 507.) (April 7).
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 2, 2015: Unfinished Business SB11 Beall Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 1, 2015: SB 11 Beall Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 2, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB11 Beall
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor