+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3238.) (March 28).
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 28, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor