+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 4627.) Reconsideration granted.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and N.R. & W.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2018: [04-10-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.]
- Yeas: 7
April 10, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3