+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4995.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 9, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor