+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6102.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4144.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4003.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (April 6).
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1090 Mitchell Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2016: SB 1090 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BURKE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
June 2, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1090 Mitchell
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor