+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5859.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4492.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 20.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2018: SB 1089 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 80
June 12, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2018: Noes:
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2018: Consent Calendar SB1089 Jackson
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
March 20, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor