+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6059.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6797.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4380.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1087 Roth Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2018: SB 1087 Roth Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
June 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1087 Roth
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 30, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor