+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5333.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3933.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3782.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3324.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: SB 1083 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Holden
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1083 Skinner Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
June 28, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: Special Consent SB1083
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor