+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4042.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4003.) (May 27).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3395.) (April 5).
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 21, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1075 Runner By Anderson
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor