+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 810, Statutes of 2022.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 30.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 5347.)
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5201.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 6000.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 5780.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3).
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
On June 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Wiener.
- Ordered to second reading.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wiener.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (10)
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB107 Wiener et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2022: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2022: SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wilson
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
August 22, 2022: SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wilson Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 7
August 8, 2022: SB 107 Wiener Senate Third Reading Amend By WILSON Set #1
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 10
August 3, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 8, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 6, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB107 Wiener et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
March 9, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor