+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3708.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3278.) (April 28).
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
April 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor