+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 199, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4293.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 5704.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3339.) (April 30).
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1060 Liu Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 26, 2014: SB 1060 Liu Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 9
June 11, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 8, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd SB1060 Liu
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
April 30, 2014: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor