+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3497.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor