+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 317, Statutes of 2022.
On August 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4932.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 5886.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3).
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3889.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3781.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3168.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1058 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
August 15, 2022: SB 1058 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Mia Bonta
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1058 Durazo
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor