+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 4348.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4914.) (May 2).
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 2, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1056 Beall et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7