+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5779.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3954.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- March 29 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 11, 2016: SB 1055 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 3, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
June 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 26, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1055 Hueso
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor