+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 575, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4907.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6418.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 24).
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3696.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3707.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3280.) (April 24).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1052 Torres Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 25, 2014: SB 1052 Torres Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1052 Torres
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor