+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 2161.)
On June 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
May 11, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB105 B. & F.R.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor