+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 29).
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- March 29 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1049 Hill
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor