+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 5412.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 3794.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3613.) (May 28).
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 31, 2020: SB 1049 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB1049 Glazer et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
May 28, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1