+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.