+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4696.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 5, 2018: SB 1042 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
June 27, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2018: Consent Calendar SB1042
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2018: Consire, Mitchell, Monning, Moorlach, Morrell, Newman, Nguyen, Nielsen, Pan, Portantino, Roth, Skinner, Stern, Stone, Vidak, Wieckowski, Wiener, Wilk
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor