+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3332.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 30, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor