+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 225, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5828.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 13 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3825.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3781.) (May 19).
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (7)
August 11, 2022: SB 1041 Atkins Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 3, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
May 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1041 Atkins et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 16, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor