+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 690, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6059.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6779.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4452.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4556.) (April 4).
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1041 Leyva et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2018: SB 1041 Leyva Senate Third Reading By REYES
- Yeas: 80
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB1041
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 23, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9