+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 319, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6047.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
- Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3503.) (May 19).
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3343.) (April 30).
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 18, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1039 Hernandez Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 14, 2014: SB 1039 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
June 17, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 14
May 23, 2014: Special Consent #15 SB1039 Hernandez
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
May 19, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
April 30, 2014: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor