+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 485, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 6125.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 6).
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3658.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3707.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 18, 2014: SB 1036 Pavley Senate Third Reading By WEBER
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 8
August 6, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
June 17, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1036 Pavley
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor