+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 313, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 6296.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6).
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 3. Page 4189.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 21, 2014: SB 1031 De León Third Reading Urgency By GATTO
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1031 De León Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 10
April 28, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor