+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4677.) (April 16).
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4517.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1030 Newman
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 3, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor