+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4294.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5745.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3267.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3092.) (April 8).
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Set for hearing April 8.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 4, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1027 Hill Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 30, 2014: SB 1027 Hill Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 17, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
June 10, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
April 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1027 Hill
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
April 8, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor