+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2022.
On September 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5316.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended.
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 3981.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3780.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 3508.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 20 hearing postponed by committee.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1020 Laird et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 29, 2022: SB 1020 Laird Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 9
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
June 27, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1020 Laird et al.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor