+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (35)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5860.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6591.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4404.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4717.) (April 18).
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 14.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 28, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1019 Beall et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2018: SB 1019 Beall Senate Third Reading By RUBIO
- Yeas: 80
August 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 19, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 15
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1019 Beall et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
March 14, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 9