+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5331.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 28).
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 21).
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3779.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3513.) (April 26).
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: SB 1018 Pan Senate Third Reading By Gabriel
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 8
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1018 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
June 28, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
June 21, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
May 25, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1018 Pan
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 16, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor