+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5954.)
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 10).
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 29).
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 3929.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3610.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and JUD.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 19, 2016: SB 1017 Hill Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 10, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1017 Hill Motions
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 11
April 19, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor