+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 423.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 29.
On December 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 9, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor