+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2766.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 3161.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 9.) (September 11).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected September 8).
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 2891.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 25. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 386.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to second reading.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 11, 2015: SB 101 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 2) SB101 Committee on B.F.&R. Concurrence Leno
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 2) SB101 Committee on B.F.&R. Concurrence Leno
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
September 4, 2015: SB 101 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By WEBER Set #1
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
September 4, 2015: SB 101 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By WEBER Set #1
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
March 23, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB101 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor