+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 827, Statutes of 2022.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 5331.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 29).
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 14).
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 6. Page 3968.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3779.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: SB 1008 Becker Senate Third Reading By Mia Bonta
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 8
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1008 Becker et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
June 29, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1008 Becker
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 11
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1