+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 588, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 5535.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5534.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lara.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 5530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 5890.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3845.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3418.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1008 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
August 30, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1008 Lara Concurrence Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
August 18, 2016: SB 1008 Lara Senate Third Reading By GIPSON
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 3, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
June 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
May 12, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1008 Lara
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
April 6, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor