+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor