+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 782, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5450.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 12. Page 6233.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 4040.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4001.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13 in L. & I.R. pending receipt.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3394.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 26, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1001 Mitchell Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
August 24, 2016: SB 1001 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By CHIU
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
June 22, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1001 Mitchell
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
April 5, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1