+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23).
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 28.
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor