+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (13)
+ − Actions (47)
On September 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5966.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 33. Page 6733.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 3).
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
- September 11 hearing postponed by committee.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
- Coauthors revised.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On July 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 5 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 9 p.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 25).
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 1005.) (May 9).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 29, 2018: Unfinished Business SB100 De León et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
August 28, 2018: SB 100 De León Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 3
August 28, 2018: SB 100 De León Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER Motion to Appeal the Decision of the Chair By MELENDEZ
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 5
September 1, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
July 13, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 3
July 12, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB100 De León
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 22, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 9, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor