+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 18.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor