+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 811.).
- Coauthors revised.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 4).
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
March 4, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor