+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced measure version corrected.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Page 4504.).
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 28, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor