+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 3134.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2505.)
On August 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2395.)
- Coauthors revised.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2390.)
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 18).
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
September 9, 2019: ACR 99 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 7
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR99 Low et al. By Umberg
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2019: Be adopted as amended.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor