+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2842.)
- Coauthors revised.
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 26, 2019: ACR 98 Wicks Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 21, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
July 9, 2019: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor