+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 4687.).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
April 12, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor